EP0801687 - ELECTROCHEMILUMINESCENCE ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioVeris Corporation 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states BioVeris Corporation 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg Maryland 20877 / US | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states IGEN International, Inc. 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Igen International, Inc. 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states IGEN, INC. 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Mark, T. 6516 Old Farm Court N. Bethesda, MD 20852 / US | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1997/43] | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96903355.4 | 04.01.1996 | [1997/43] | WO1996US00120 | Priority number, date | US19950368429 | 04.01.1995 Original published format: US 368429 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621039 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801687 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801687 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/06, G01N33/53, A61K51/00, C07D327/10, C07D277/06 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
C07D277/06 (EP,US);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
G01N2333/986 (EP,US);
G01N2415/00 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/43] | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/06, G01N33/53, A61K51/00, C07D327/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMOLUMINESZENZ-TEST | [1997/43] | English: | ELECTROCHEMILUMINESCENCE ASSAY | [1997/43] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'ELECTROCHIMIOLUMINESCENCE (B-LACTAMES) | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.11.2003 | NL | 19.11.2003 | LU | 04.01.2004 | IE | 05.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | DK | 19.02.2004 | GR | 19.02.2004 | SE | 19.02.2004 | ES | 02.03.2004 | PT | 19.04.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/23] | NL | 19.11.2003 | |
LU | 04.01.2004 | ||
IE | 05.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | NL | 19.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | NL | 19.11.2003 | |
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | NL | 19.11.2003 | |
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
ES | 02.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | NL | 19.11.2003 | |
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 19.11.2003 | |
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 19.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5147806 (KAMIN RALPH A [US], et al) [A] 1,10,13 * column 10, line 1 - line 16 *; | [E]WO9640978 (IGEN INC [US]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9641175 (IGEN INC [US]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [T] - P. LIANG ET AL, "Electroluminescence-Based Detection of beta-Lactam Antibiotics and beta-Lactamases", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, ,, (1996), vol. 68, pages 2426 - 2431, XP002115833 [T] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac951072p | International search | [Y]US4764462 (BREDEHORST REINHARD [US], et al) | [Y] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 37, Number 9, issued 1991, BLACKBURN et al., "Electrochemiluminescence Detection for Development of Immunoassays and DNA Probe Assays for Clinical Diagnostics", pages 1534-1539. | [Y] - JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Volume 103, Number 3, issued 1981, RUBENSTEIN et al., "Electrogenerated Chemiluminescence. 37. Aqueous Ecl Systems Based on Ru(2,2'-bipyridine)32+ and Oxalate or Organic Acids", pages 512-516. |