EP0827423 - FUNCTIONALIZED CHAIN EXTENDED INITIATORS FOR ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 1735 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [1998/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWINDEMAN, James, Anthony Apartment 69, 920 Sedgefield Drive Shelby, NC 28152 / US | 02 /
KAMIENSKI, Conrad, William 516 Eastwood Drive Gastonia, NC 28012 / US | 03 /
MORRISON, Robert, Charles 1536 Stableview Drive Gastonia, NC 28056 / US | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 96903359.6 | 05.01.1996 | [1998/11] | WO1996US00172 | Priority number, date | US19950436780 | 08.05.1995 Original published format: US 436780 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635509 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827423 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827423 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/00, C07F1/02, C08F4/48, C08F8/20, C08F36/04, C08F279/02, C08F4/46, C07F1/00, C08C19/44 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C08F12/04 (EP,US);
C08C19/44 (EP,US);
C08F12/06 (EP,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F36/04 (EP,US);
C08F4/46 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F12/04, C08F4/46 (EP,US);
C08F36/04, C08F4/46 (US,EP);
C08F36/04, C08F4/72 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | B01J31/00, C07F1/02, C08F4/48, C08F8/20, C08F36/04, C08F279/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/11] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONELLE STARTER MIT VERLÄNGERTER KETTE FÜR DIE ANIONISCHE POLYMERISATION | [1998/11] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED CHAIN EXTENDED INITIATORS FOR ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION | [1998/11] | French: | INITIATEURS FONCTIONNALISES A CHAINE ETENDUE DE POLYMERISATION ANIONIQUE | [1998/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2007 | BE | 12.12.2007 | CH | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | LI | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | LU | 05.01.2008 | IE | 07.01.2008 | IT | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | ES | 23.03.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | [2011/27] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
LU | 05.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 07.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 07.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CH | 12.12.2007 | ||
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 12.12.2007 | |
LI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3842146 (MILKOVICH R, et al); | [A]US3862100 (HALASA ADEL FARHAN, et al); | [A]US4039593 (KAMIENSKI CONRAD W, et al); | [X]US5331058 (SHEPHERD NEIL [GB], et al); | [A]US5391663 (BENING ROBERT C [US], et al); | [AP]US5416168 (WILLIS CARL L [US], et al) |