EP0756558 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DOSING FREE-FLOWING MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Afuema Abfüllmaschinen GmbH Hauptstrasse 117-119 06862 Rosslau / DE | [1997/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Wolfgang Otto-Baer-Strasse 49 39118 Magdeburg / DE | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Erich, Dieter Patentanwalt August-Bebel-Ring 36 15751 Niederlehme bei Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Erich, Dieter Patentanwalt August-Bebel-Ring 36 15751 Niederlehme bei Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 96903915.5 | 20.02.1996 | [1997/06] | WO1996DE00338 | Priority number, date | DE1995107817 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19507817 | [1997/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626111 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756558 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756558 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/34, G05D7/06 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
G05D7/0682 (EP,US);
B65B3/34 (EP,US);
G05D11/132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIEREN FLIESSFÄHIGER MEDIEN | [1997/06] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DOSING FREE-FLOWING MEDIA | [1997/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE SUBSTANCES COULANTES | [1997/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.09.1998 | GB | 09.09.1998 | IT | 09.09.1998 | SE | 09.12.1998 | AT | 20.02.1999 | BE | 28.02.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 09.09.1998 | |
GB | 09.09.1998 | ||
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
AT | 20.02.1999 | ||
BE | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/51] | GB | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
AT | 20.02.1999 | ||
BE | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
BE | 28.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | GB | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
FR | 05.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 09.09.1998 | |
SE | 09.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 09.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [DY]DD297123 (SCHRÖDER) [DY] 4,5; | [A]EP0426266 (ABC SEBRN TECHCORP INC [US]); | [YA]EP0444269 (HENNEL EWALD [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * claim 1 * [A] 1; | [DYA]WO9202787 (SCHROEDER WOLFGANG [DE]) [DY] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [A]US5316444 (WICNIENSKI MICHAEL F [US]) |