EP0757574 - STIMULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/07] | ELECTRODE ARRANGEMENT AND STIMULATION SYSTEM | ||
[2001/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 D-12359 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOIZ, Armin Friedrich-Bauer-Strasse 42 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
SCHALDACH, Max Turnstrasse 5 D-91054 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
WETZIG, Thomas Hans-Paulus-Strasse 5 D-91088 Bubenreuth / DE | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Christiansen, Henning, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Christiansen, Henning, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/07] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 96903922.1 | 26.02.1996 | [1997/07] | WO1996DE00350 | Priority number, date | DE1995107929 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19507929 | [1997/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625973 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757574 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757574 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/07] | Title | German: | STIMULATIONSSYSTEM | [2001/42] | English: | STIMULATION SYSTEM | [2001/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE STIMULATION | [2001/42] |
Former [1997/07] | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND STIMULATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [1997/07] | ELECTRODE ARRANGEMENT AND STIMULATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [1997/07] | ENSEMBLE ELECTRODE ET SYSTEME DE STIMULATION | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9221278 (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1,3-9,12-18 * page 10, line 32 - page 16, line 13; figure - *; | [A]WO9406507 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9,11,12 * page 8, line 13 - page 12, line 12; figure - *; | [A]WO9400050 (AMERICAN CARDIAC ABLATION [US]) [A] 1,3-9,12 * page 4, line 12 - page 10, line 14; figure - *; | [A]EP0500215 (ANGELASE INC [US]) [A] 4-7 * page 3, column 4, line 6 - page 4, column 6, line 55; figure - * | Examination | DE4207368 | DE4231603 | US4955382 |