EP0756679 - STOP VALVE WITH ADJUSTABLE RESTRICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [1997/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLBAEK, Jens, Jorgen Nyvej 12, Lavensby DK-6430 Nordborg / DK | [1997/06] | Application number, filing date | 96903931.2 | 19.02.1996 | [1997/06] | WO1996DK00074 | Priority number, date | SE19950000658 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: SE 9500658 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626375 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756679 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/52 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
F16K1/523 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/06] | Title | German: | APSPERRVENTIL MIT EINSTELLBAREM DURCHFLUSSWIDERSTAND | [1997/06] | English: | STOP VALVE WITH ADJUSTABLE RESTRICTION | [1997/06] | French: | SOUPAPE D'ARRET | [1997/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/26] | 13.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2506592 ; | [A]DE3743707 |