EP0771275 - RADIAL TYRE CROWN REINFORCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLUZEL, Guy 30, rue de la Chataigneraie F-63110 Beaumont / FR | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Devaux, Edmond-Yves, et al Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 01 / FR | [1997/19] | Application number, filing date | 96903945.2 | 30.01.1996 | [1997/19] | WO1996EP00347 | Priority number, date | FR19950001705 | 13.02.1995 Original published format: FR 9501705 | [1997/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625297 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771275 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771275 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/20 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B60C9/22 (EP,US);
B60C9/18 (EP,US);
B60C9/185 (EP,US);
B60C9/20 (EP,US);
B60C9/2006 (EP,US);
B60C9/2009 (EP,US);
B60C2009/1842 (EP,US);
B60C2009/1871 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10765 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | GÜRTEL FÜR RADIALREIFEN | [1997/19] | English: | RADIAL TYRE CROWN REINFORCEMENT | [1997/19] | French: | ARMATURE DE SOMMET POUR PNEUMATIQUE RADIAL | [1997/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 21.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3327670 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 14 - line 28; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4696335 (TSUKAGOSHI TETSUHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 11, line 4 - line 11; claim - * |