EP0809488 - SOLID ACTIVE AGENT PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRABOWSKI, Sven Pfalzgrafenstrasse 53 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
BREITENBACH, Jörg Hans-Sachs-Ring 11 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
ROSENBERG, Joerg Bruchstrasse 29 D-67158 Ellerstadt / DE | 04 /
SANNER, Axel Lorscher Ring 2c D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [1997/49] | Application number, filing date | 96903958.5 | 01.02.1996 | [1997/49] | WO1996EP00417 | Priority number, date | DE1995104832 | 14.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19504832 | [1997/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625151 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809488 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809488 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/49] | Title | German: | FESTE WIRKSTOFF-ZUBEREITUNGEN | [1997/49] | English: | SOLID ACTIVE AGENT PREPARATIONS | [1997/49] | French: | PREPARATIONS SOLIDES DE CONSTITUANTS ACTIFS | [1997/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0398033 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-6* page 2, line 1 - page 5, line 55 *; | [Y]EP0544144 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column W *; | [Y] - M. MATSUMURA ET AL., "COMPUTER OPTIMIZATION FOR THE FORMULATION OF CONTROLLED-RELEASE THEOPHYLLINE TABLET MADE OF MICRONIZED LOW-SUBSTITUTED HYDROXYPROPYLCELLULOSE AND METHYLCELLULOSE", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, TOKYO (JP), (199409), vol. 42, no. 9, pages 1902 - 1908, XP000476614 [Y] 1,2,4-6 * page 1902 - page 1903 * |