EP0751857 - METHOD OF RESIN TRANSFER MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McDONNELL DOUGLAS HELICOPTER COMPANY 5000 E. McDowell Rd. Mesa Arizona 85205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states McDONNELL DOUGLAS HELICOPTER COMPANY 5000 E. McDowell Rd. Mesa Arizona 85205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBRACHTA, Kevin, L. 3512 Crescent Avenue Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1997/02] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf & Steimle Gerokstrasse 6 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96904479.1 | 29.01.1996 | [1997/02] | WO1996US00719 | Priority number, date | US19950379015 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: US 379015 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622871 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751857 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, B29C47/00, B29D9/00 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
B29C70/48 (EP);
B29C37/005 (EP);
B29C37/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFER-SPRITZGIESSEN VON KUNSTHARZ | [1997/02] | English: | METHOD OF RESIN TRANSFER MOLDING | [1997/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE MOULAGE DE TRANSFERT DE RESINE | [1997/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 26.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/24] | 24.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1998 | 01.02.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0539182 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 6 * * column 6, line 7 - line 49; figures 5-7 * * claim 8 *; | [X]EP0054084 (DALEN HENDRIK VAN) [X] 1-3,5 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 5 *; | [X]US3975479 (MCCLEAN WILLIAM GEORGE) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 46; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2435610 ; | [Y]US3044118 ; | [Y]US3670066 ; | [Y]US4563324 ; | [Y]US4810444 ; | [Y]US4923666 ; | [Y]US4943407 ; | [X]US5023041 ; | [Y]US5204033 ; | [YP]US5433915 ; | [Y]USRE28498E ; | [Y]JPS61181617 |