|
25.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
54 |
|
18.07.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
54 |
|
17.05.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.02.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2011 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2011 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.01.2011 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
05.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2010 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
70 |
|
01.10.2010 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
64 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.07.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
19 |
|
23.06.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
52 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
52 |
|
04.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
26.10.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.09.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
75 |
|
23.06.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.06.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Appeal |
34 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Appeal |
34 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
07.01.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
02.01.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2001 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2000 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2000 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Appendix to new European patent application |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Appendix to new European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Appendix to new European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Appendix to new European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Appendix to new European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Appendix to new European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.1998 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.08.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
15.08.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
56 |