EP0806032 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTION AND BYPASS OF TANDEM VOCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEAVER, Lindsay, A., Jr. 1162 Cherryvale Road Boulder, CO 80303 / US | 02 /
LAM, S., Katherine 9858 Caminito Calor San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 03 /
JACOBS, Paul, E. 9075 La Jolla Shores Lane La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 04 /
GARDNER, Willima, R. 4650 Exbury Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
DEJACO, Andrew, P. 10424 Flanders Cove San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 06 /
SIH, Gilbert, C. 7804 Pipat Place San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1998/40] |
Former [1997/46] | 01 /
WEAVER, Lindsay, A., Jr. 1162 Cherryvale Road Boulder, CO 80303 / US | ||
02 /
LAM, S., Katherine 9858 Caminito Calor San Diego, CA 92131 / US | |||
03 /
JACOBS, Paul, E. 9075 La Jolla Shores Lane La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
04 /
GARDNER, Willima, R. 4650 Exbury Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
05 /
DEJACO, Andrew, P. 10424 Flanders Cove San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
06 /
SIH, Gilbert, C. 10603 Dabney Drive 8 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [1997/46] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96904513.7 | 25.01.1996 | [1997/46] | WO1996US01166 | Priority number, date | US19950378300 | 25.01.1995 Original published format: US 378300 | US19960575287 | 11.01.1996 Original published format: US 575287 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623297 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806032 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806032 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/24, G10L19/00 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G10L19/16 (EP,US);
G10L21/02 (KR);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04W24/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1997/46] | G10L5/00, H04Q7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION UND UMGEHUNG VON TANDEM-SPRACHKODIERUNG | [1997/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTION AND BYPASS OF TANDEM VOCODING | [1997/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINE A LA DETECTION ET AU CONTOURNEMENT DU CODAGE DE LA VOIX EN TANDEM | [1997/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 08.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2001 | Decision despatched | 20.09.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2001 | Decision despatched | 21.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 21.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.2002 | BE | 10.04.2002 | CH | 10.04.2002 | GR | 10.04.2002 | IT | 10.04.2002 | LI | 10.04.2002 | NL | 10.04.2002 | DK | 10.07.2002 | PT | 10.07.2002 | SE | 10.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.04.2002 | |
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 10.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US4782326 (BUSH DAVID E [US]) [X] 1-4,12,18,19,21,28 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 16 * [A] 32 [Y] 10,11,29-31; | [Y]WO9300778 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [Y] 10,11,29-31 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 22 *; | [A]EP0605311 (ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE [FR]) [A] 1,10-12,18,29,32 * abstract * * column 6, line 40 - line 57 *; | [A] - E.D. HANSON, "intelligibility testing of the continuous variable slope delta (cvsv) coder-decoder (codec)", RESEARCH AND DEVELLOPMENT TECHNICAL REPORT ECOM-3393, FORT MONMOUTH, NJ, USA, (197102), pages 1 - 11, XP000573297 [A] 1,10-12,18,29,32 * abstract * * page 5, line 6 - line 34 * * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * |