EP0957809 - METHOD FOR APPLYING ADHESIVE TO THE BASE OF AN ORTHODONTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBS, Dwight, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
PUTTLER, Oliver, L. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
GEORGAKIS, Evangelos, G. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
AMUNDSON, Allen, B. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
JORDAN, Russell, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96904556.6 | 01.02.1996 | [1999/47] | WO1996US01453 | Priority number, date | US19950407622 | 21.03.1995 Original published format: US 407622 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9629018 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957809 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957809 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/12 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B05D1/286 (EP,US);
A61C7/16 (EP,US);
B05D3/042 (EP,US);
B05D5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON KLEBSTOFF AUF DIE BASIS EINER ORTHODONTISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2003/26] | English: | METHOD FOR APPLYING ADHESIVE TO THE BASE OF AN ORTHODONTIC APPLIANCE | [1999/47] | French: | PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UN ADHESIF A LA BASE D'UN APPAREIL ORTHODONTIQUE | [1999/47] |
Former [1999/47] | METHODE ZUM ANBRINGEN VON KLEBSTOFF AUF DIE BODENLAGEN EINER ORTHODONTISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.1997 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 07.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.06.2003 | IT | 25.06.2003 | GB | 01.02.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 25.06.2003 | |
GB | 01.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 01.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4204325 (KAELBLE DAVID H [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4919615 (CROLL THEODORE P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9302631 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US5328363 (CHESTER BRUCE E [US], et al); | [DA]US5354199 (JACOBS DWIGHT W [US], et al) |