EP0814686 - DEVICE FOR ATTACHING THE FRONT PANEL OF A DRAWER TO THE MOUNTING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum Gesellschaft m.b.H. Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜSTLE, Klaus Rüttenen 5 A-6973 Höchst / AT | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Engelbert Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Hofinger, Engelbert, DDr. Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 96904658.0 | 14.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996AT00047 | Priority number, date | AT19950000487 | 20.03.1995 Original published format: AT 48795 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628995 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814686 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
A47B88/956 (EP,US);
A47B88/00 (KR);
A47B88/95 (EP,US);
A47B2088/951 (EP,US);
A47B2088/955 (EP,US);
A47B2210/02 (EP,US);
A47B2230/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [1998/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG DER FRONTBLENDE EINER SCHUBLADE AN SCHUBLADENZARGEN | [1998/02] | English: | DEVICE FOR ATTACHING THE FRONT PANEL OF A DRAWER TO THE MOUNTING FRAME | [1998/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE LA FACADE D'UN TIROIR A UN CADRE DE MONTAGE | [1998/10] |
Former [1998/02] | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE LA FA ADE D'UN TIROIR A UN CADRE DE MONTAGE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 06.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/26] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0267477 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0636327 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE9419610U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,7,10 |