EP0814695 - LOADING DEVICE FOR A WIPING MATERIAL DISPENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Granger, Maurice 17 rue Marcel Pagnol F-42270 Saint-Priest-en-Jarez / FR | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96904915.4 | 28.02.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996FR00305 | Priority number, date | FR19950003312 | 15.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9503312 | [1998/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628080 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814695 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814695 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/34, A47K10/40 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
A47K10/40 (EP,US);
A47K10/34 (KR);
A47K10/3687 (EP,US);
A47K10/3643 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR SPENDER VON AUFWISCHMATERIAL | [1998/02] | English: | LOADING DEVICE FOR A WIPING MATERIAL DISPENSING APPARATUS | [1998/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT POUR APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR DE MATERIAUX D'ESSUYAGE | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1036952 (NEUCO APP BAU AG) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 69 - page 2, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB1180183 (WICKENBERG CHESTER HUGO [US]); | [A]GB2028765 (LATZ P); | [A]US4213363 (GRANGER MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [DA]FR2555975 (GRANGER MAURICE [FR]) [DA] 6,8,9 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0461732 (SCOTT PAPER CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0483749 (FELDMUEHLE GMBH SCOTT [DE]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5249755 (JESPERSEN PAUL W [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 4; figure 1 * |