EP0813589 - HYPOCHLORITE CLEANERS WITH REDUCED SKIN MALODOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NA, Henry, Cheng 9892 Jane Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 02 /
RODRIGUEZ, Pedro, Antonio 1541 Jonquil Meadow Forest Park, OH 45240 / US | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 96905472.5 | 14.02.1996 | [1997/52] | WO1996US01909 | Priority number, date | US19950398475 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: US 398475 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627652 | Date: | 12.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813589 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/395 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/3951 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/52] | Title | German: | HYPOCHLORITREINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT VERRINGERTEM HAUTGERUCH | [1997/52] | English: | HYPOCHLORITE CLEANERS WITH REDUCED SKIN MALODOR | [1997/52] | French: | AGENTS NETTOYANTS A L'HYPOCHLORITE REDUISANT LES MAUVAISES ODEURS CUTANEES | [1997/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 12.02.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4148742 (CRUTCHFIELD M.M. ET AL.) [DX] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 20 * * claim - *; | [DA]JPS63108099 ; | [DA]US4257906 (CRUTCHFIELD MARVIN M.) [DA] 1,2,5,7 * claim - *; | [DA]US4088611 (SUZUKI HIROSHI ET AL.) [DA] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US4233173 (MAYER J.M. ET AL.) [DA] 1 * claim - * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 25, Database accession no. 88-171056, XP002006921 & JPS63108099 A 19880512 (LION CORP.) [DA] 1,4,5 * abstract * |