EP0758428 - ASSEMBLY CONSISTING OF A CONTROL STATION AND A RAISED WORKING PLATFORM ENABLING ACCESS TO A MOVABLE SCAFFOLDING OR ESCAMOBILE AND A CONVERTIBLE VERSION OR ESCA 2000, FOR USE AS A MULTIDIRECTIONAL-DRIVE MANUAL-PROPULSION LADDER VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pommier, Pierre ESCA 2000 Mondial-Souplechelle 174, rue du Maréchal-Foch 95150 Taverny / FR | [1999/48] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states Pommier, Pierre 174, rue du Maréchal-Foch 95150 Taverny / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/48] |
Former [1998/22] | Mihura, Sabine Cabinet S. Mihura, 55, rue Ste Anne 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/08] | Mihura, Sabine Cabinet S. Mihura, 4 rue de Ventadour 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96905906.2 | 04.03.1996 | [1997/08] | WO1996FR00336 | Priority number, date | deleted | [1997/09] |
Former [1997/08] | FR19950002469 | 03.03.1995 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9627729 | Date: | 12.09.1996 | [1996/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758428 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E06C1/397, E04G1/24 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
E06C1/397 (EP);
E04G1/24 (EP);
E06C1/39 (EP);
E04G2001/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [1998/36] |
Former [1997/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LENKVORRICHTUNG FUER TREPPENLEITERFAHRZEUG | [1997/08] | English: | ASSEMBLY CONSISTING OF A CONTROL STATION AND A RAISED WORKING PLATFORM ENABLING ACCESS TO A MOVABLE SCAFFOLDING OR ESCAMOBILE AND A CONVERTIBLE VERSION OR ESCA 2000, FOR USE AS A MULTIDIRECTIONAL-DRIVE MANUAL-PROPULSION LADDER VEHICLE | [1997/08] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONSTITUE, NACELLE ET PLATE-FORME DE TRAVAIL EN HAUTEUR AVEC ACCES SUR ESCAMOBILE ET LE CONVERTIBLE ESCA 2000, ECHELLE AUTOMOBILE A PROPULSION MANUELLE ET ENTRAINEMENT MULTIDIRECTIONNEL | [1997/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.01.1997 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.1998 | 31.03.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2000 | 31.03.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2003 | 31.03.2004 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2005 | 31.03.2006 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2592355 (POMMIER, P.) [Y] 1-11 * voir figure 1, détail 1, figure 8 *; | [Y]US3276542 (POMMIER, P.) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,3 * |