EP0872249 - GENE TRANSFER PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. 408, Tashirodaikanmachi Tosu-shi, Saga 841 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO. INC. 408, Tashirodaikanmachi Tosu-shi Saga 841 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMA, Hidekazu, Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. Tsukuba Lab., 1-25-11, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 02 /
IIJIMA, Osamu, Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. Tsukuba Lab., 1-25-11, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Yosuke, Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. Tsukuba Lab., 1-25-11, Kannondai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/43] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96906024.3 | 15.03.1996 | [1998/43] | WO1996JP00652 | Priority number, date | JP19950059261 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5926195 | [1998/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9629096 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872249 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K9/14, A61K31/70, A61K35/76, A61K47/10, A61K47/18, A61K47/26, // C12N7/01, C12N15/68, C12N15/86 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1998/43] | Title | German: | GENTRANSFERPRÄPARATION | [1998/43] | English: | GENE TRANSFER PREPARATION | [1998/43] | French: | PREPARATION DE TRANSFERT GENIQUE | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1997 | Translation filed | 17.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2076787 (MERIEUX INST) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9510601 (VIAGENE INC [US]) [PX] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X] - KOTANI H ET AL, "IMPROVED METHODS OF RETROVIRAL VECTOR TRANSDUCTION AND PRODUCTION FOR GENE THERAPY", HUMAN GENE THERAPY,XX,XX, (1994), vol. 5, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 19 - 28, XP000653182 [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * | [X] - FUKUMOTO, FUMIYOSHI ET AL, "Effect of various additives on the preservation of southern bean mosaic virus", NIPPON SHOKUBUTSU BYORI GAKKAIHO ( 1985 ), 51(4), 413-20, XP001008354 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - HEKKER, A. C. ET AL, "Stabilizer for lyophilization of rubella virus", ARCH. GESAMTE VIRUSFORSCH. ( 1970 ), 29(2-3), 257-62, XP001007425 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01249311 | International search | [A]WO9519427 (GENETIC THERAPY INC [US]); | [Y] - TOMONOKAI OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, "Rev. ed. 2 Experimental Virology General Description", (1973), MARUZEN, p. 53-59, Section of "5.2 Freeze-Drying". | [A] - KOTANI HITOSHI, ET AL, "IMPROVED METHODS OF RETROVIRAL VECTOR TRANSDUCTION AND PRODUCTION FOR GENE THERAPY", Chemical Abstracts Service (C A S), (19940101), Database accession no. 121:223170Y, XP002948738 |