EP0840853 - PACKINGLESS PUMP AND LIQUID SPRAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Titan-Tool, Inc. 107 Bauer Drive Oakland, NJ 07436 / US | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENFRO, Wesley, E. 339 Hill Road Rosenberg, TX 77471 / US | 02 /
HOPKINS, Marty, H. 1806 Pitts Road Richmond, TX 77469 / US | 03 /
SAMPLE, Michael, T. 4127 Bayou Grove Taylor Lake Village, TX 77586 / US | 04 /
SKARZYNSKI, James, N. 347 Hill Road Rosenberg, TX 77471 / US | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [1998/20] | Application number, filing date | 96906191.0 | 29.01.1996 | [1998/20] | WO1996US00956 | Priority number, date | US19950379917 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: US 379917 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623592 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840853 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/107, B05B9/04 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
F04B53/1087 (EP,US);
B05B15/25 (EP,US);
B05B9/01 (EP,US);
B05B9/0413 (EP,US);
F04B43/107 (EP,US);
F04B53/1002 (EP,US);
F05C2201/0412 (EP,US);
F05C2203/0821 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7559 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7838 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/20] | Title | German: | PACKUNGSLOSE PUMPE MIT FLÜSSIGKEITS SPRITZSYSTEM | [1998/20] | English: | PACKINGLESS PUMP AND LIQUID SPRAY SYSTEM | [1998/20] | French: | SYSTEME HYDROMECANIQUE POUR POMPER ET PULVERISER DES LIQUIDES, DEPOURVU DE GARNITURES D'ETANCHEITE | [1998/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 29.09.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2960936 (DEAN WILLIAM M, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 72; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3270684 (JEAN PASQUALI, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 23-52; figure 1 *; | [X]US3317141 (CARL MANN) [X] 1,2 * column 13, line 51 - column 15, line 28; figure 9 *; | [X]US4671743 (FREY BERNHARD [CH]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 62; figures 1,1A * | International search | [A]US1702298 ; | [A]US1788810 (TITTEMORE FRANK A); | [X]US3001723 (BOUNDS WALLACE A); | [A]US4934603 (LASLEY CHARLES T [US]) |