EP0809503 - METHOD OF LESSENING THE RISK OF VERTEBRAL FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARPF, David, B. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
CAPIZZI, Thomas, P. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
QUAN, Hui 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
SANTORA, Arthur, C., II 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 05 /
YATES, Ashley, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96906412.0 | 13.02.1996 | [1997/49] | WO1996US01946 | Priority number, date | US19950389860 | 17.02.1995 Original published format: US 389860 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625166 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809503 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/66 | [1997/49] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/52] |
Former [1997/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER VERTEBRALEN BRUCHZUSSICHT | [1997/49] | English: | METHOD OF LESSENING THE RISK OF VERTEBRAL FRACTURES | [1997/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE DIMINUTION DES RISQUES DE FRACTURES VERTEBRALES | [1997/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/08] | 18.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4761406 (FLORA LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * claims 1,15 *; | [XY]EP0600834 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 7-12 * page 2, lines 22,23 - line 53; claim 5 * [Y] 1-6,13-24; | [Y]WO9421266 (LEIRAS OY [FI]) [Y] 1-24 * page 5; claims 2,10 *; | [X] - ADAMI, BARONI, BROGGINI ET AL., "Treatment of postmenopausal osteoporosis with continuous daily oral alendronate in comparison with either placebo or intranasal salmon calcitonin", OSTEOPOROSIS INT., (1993), vol. sup3, pages s21 - 27, XP002175823 [X] 1-24 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01623004 | [Y] - STORM, THAMSBORG, STEINICHE, "Effect of intermittent cyclical etinodrate therapy on bone mass and fracture rate in women with postmenopausal osteoporosis", N ENGL J MED, (1990), vol. 322, pages 1265 - 1271, XP002175824 [Y] 1-24 * page 1270, column 2, line 30-34 *; page 1265, column 2, paragraph 4 * | [A] - FLEISCH, "The use of bisphosphonates in osteoporosis", BR. J. CLIN. PRACT., Berne, Switzerland, (199411), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 323 - 326, XP001012849 [A] 1-24 * page 325 * | International search | [Y]US4621077 (ROSINI SERGIO [IT], et al) |