EP0820653 - TRACTION BATTERY CHARGING WITH INDUCTIVE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norvik Traction Inc. 2480 Dunwin Drive Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Norvik Traction Inc. 2480 Dunwin Drive Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOR, Jiri, K. 318 Pinehurst Drive Oakville, Ontario L6J 4X5 / CA | 02 /
SOLTYS, Josef, V. 2260 Oneida Crescent Mississauga, Ontario L5C 1V6 / CA | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 96907227.1 | 25.03.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996CA00177 | Priority number, date | US19950419188 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: US 419188 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632768 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820653 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820653 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/11 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/31 (EP,US);
B60L53/56 (EP,US);
B60L53/67 (EP,US);
B60L55/00 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
B60L2200/22 (EP,US);
B60L2270/32 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,US);
Y04S10/126 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/05] | Title | German: | TRAKTIONSBATTERIELADESYSTEM MIT INDUKTIVER ANKOPPLUNG | [1998/05] | English: | TRACTION BATTERY CHARGING WITH INDUCTIVE COUPLING | [1998/05] | French: | CHARGE DE BATTERIE D'AUTOMOBILE PAR COUPLAGE INDUCTIF | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3528659 (JUNGHEINRICH KG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [AD]US5216402 (CAROSA PAUL F [US]) [AD] 2,11 * abstract *; | [A]DE4236286 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,10* abstract *; | [Y]US5327066 (SMITH HARRY F [US]) [Y] 5-8,14-17 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 27 *; | [XY]US5341083 (KLONTZ KEITH W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-13 * column A * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 63 * * column 8, line 14 - column 10, line 63 * * column 15, line 39 - column 16, line 41 * * figures 1,4,5,7,9 * [Y] 5-8,14-17 | Examination | EP0496509 |