EP0817815 - ADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI, MC | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew PLC Heron House 15 Adam Street London WC2N 6LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew PLC Heron House 15 Adam Street London WC2N 6LA / GB | ||
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew plc 2, Temple Place Victoria Embankment London WC2R 3BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBSTER, Iain 38 Wydale Road Osbaldwick, York YO1 3PG / GB | [1998/03] | Application number, filing date | 96907557.1 | 18.03.1996 | [1998/03] | WO1996GB00630 | Priority number, date | GB19950005495 | 18.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9505495 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9629374 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817815 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0817815 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/00, C09J167/00, C09J183/00, C09J175/00, A61L15/58, G03F7/038 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
C09J183/04 (EP);
A61L15/58 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C09J167/00 (EP);
C08G2170/40 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/03] | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFE | [1998/03] | English: | ADHESIVES | [1998/03] | French: | ADHESIFS | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Request for further processing for: | 20.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 06.10.2000 | PT | 06.10.2000 | AT | 18.03.2001 | DK | 18.03.2001 | GB | 18.03.2001 | LU | 18.03.2001 | ES | 19.03.2001 | IE | 19.03.2001 | SE | 19.03.2001 | BE | 31.03.2001 | CH | 31.03.2001 | LI | 31.03.2001 | MC | 31.03.2001 | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/51] | GR | 06.10.2000 | |
PT | 06.10.2000 | ||
AT | 18.03.2001 | ||
DK | 18.03.2001 | ||
GB | 18.03.2001 | ||
LU | 18.03.2001 | ||
ES | 19.03.2001 | ||
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
AT | 18.03.2001 | ||
DK | 18.03.2001 | ||
GB | 18.03.2001 | ||
LU | 18.03.2001 | ||
ES | 19.03.2001 | ||
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2004/28] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
AT | 18.03.2001 | ||
DK | 18.03.2001 | ||
GB | 18.03.2001 | ||
ES | 19.03.2001 | ||
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
AT | 18.03.2001 | ||
DK | 18.03.2001 | ||
GB | 18.03.2001 | ||
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
AT | 18.03.2001 | ||
GB | 18.03.2001 | ||
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
GB | 18.03.2001 | ||
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
IE | 19.03.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | PT | 06.10.2000 | |
SE | 19.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 06.10.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06136326 ; | [X]JPH06256494 ; | [X]US2980535 (SCHROETER CHRISTA B E, et al) [X] 1,10,11 * column 2, lines 23-43 *; | [X]US3453110 (DELZENNE GERARD ALBERT, et al) [X] 1,5,10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 66 *; | [X]US3655625 (THOMAS DANIEL C) [X] 1,3,10 * column 1, lines 47-52 *; | [X]US3737407 (THOMAS D) [X] 1,3,10 * claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 24, Database accession no. 94-197360, XP002006112 & JPH06136326 A 19940517 (TOPCON CORP) [X] 1,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 41, Database accession no. 94-330150, XP002006113 & JPH06256494 A 19940913 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [X] 1,10 * abstract * |