EP0763544 - CELLULOSE ACETATE HAVING HIGH MOLDABILITY AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Ko 198-1, Aza Takaseki, Okidai, Taishicho Ibo-gun, Hoygo 671-15 / JP | 02 /
OKANO, Toshinori 940, Shinzaike, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP | 03 /
TANIGUCHI, Hiroki 406-3, Tsuichiba, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP | 04 /
KIYOSE, Atsunobu 1903-3, Yokohama, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP | 05 /
SHIMAMOTO, Shu 500, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-12 / JP | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96907722.1 | 29.03.1996 | [1997/12] | WO1996JP00862 | Priority number, date | JP19950100711 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: JP 10071195 | JP19950085550 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8555095 | [1997/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9630413 | Date: | 03.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763544 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763544 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08B3/06, C08B3/22 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
C08B3/06 (EP,US);
C08B3/22 (EP,US);
C08L1/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L1/12, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/12] | C08B3/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/12] | Title | German: | CELLULOSEACETAT MIT HOHER VERFORMBARKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1997/12] | English: | CELLULOSE ACETATE HAVING HIGH MOLDABILITY AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [1997/12] | French: | ACETATE DE CELLULOSE A BONNE APTITUDE AU MOULAGE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ASSOCIE | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1996 | Translation filed | 22.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 22.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2024666 (STAUD CYRIL J, et al) [X] 1,7,8,12-15 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 5 * * page 1, column L, line 39 - line 55 * * claim - *; | [X]FR1049975 (RHODIACETA) [X] 1,7,8,12,13 * page 1, column L, line 31 - line 39 * | [X] - "Quantitative determination of the molecular heterogeneity of cellulose triacetate", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19831212), vol. 99, no. 24, Database accession no. 196801, XP002155617 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - KADYROVA D.M. ET AL., ZH. PRIKL. KHIM., (1983), vol. 56, no. 8, pages 1867 - 1870 | International search | [A]JPS59166501 (DAICEL CHEM) |