EP0818959 - DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT A METHOD FOR PROCESSING FISH, IN PARTICULAR SALMON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. van Wijnen B.V. Van der Hoopstraat 2 2921 LR Krimpen a/d Ijssel / NL | [1998/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SNOO, Paul Tussenlanen 15 NL-2861 CB Bergambacht / NL | 02 /
VAN BERGHEM, Karel Weena 51c NL-3013 CE Rotterdam / NL | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/04] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma, A.J. Ernststraat 595F 1082 LD Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 96907787.4 | 02.04.1996 | [1998/04] | WO1996NL00140 | Priority number, date | NL19951000026 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: NL 1000026 | [1998/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631131 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818959 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818959 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/325, A23B4/06, A23B4/08 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
A23B4/08 (EP);
A23B4/068 (EP);
A23L17/75 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [1998/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES VERFAHRENS ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON FISCH, INSBESONDERE LACHS | [1998/04] | English: | DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT A METHOD FOR PROCESSING FISH, IN PARTICULAR SALMON | [1998/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DU POISSON, NOTAMMENT DU SAUMON | [1998/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1997 | Translation filed | 24.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 26.01.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.1999
WITHDRAWN Paling en Zalmfileerderik J. Foppen B.V. Daltonstraat 240 3846 BX Harderwijk / NL Opponent's representative van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.08.1999
WITHDRAWN Paling en Zalmfileerderik J. Foppen B.V. Daltonstraat 240 3846 BX Harderwijk / NL Opponent's representative Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | 21.10.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 30.01.2000 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.12.1998 | IT | 16.12.1998 | LI | 16.12.1998 | IE | 02.04.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 16.12.1998 | |
LI | 16.12.1998 | ||
IE | 02.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 22.03.1999 | |
LI | 22.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9516364 (NIDERA HANDELSCOMPAGNIE B.V.) [PX] 1-3 * page 3; example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US1936814 (THE KROGER GROCERY & BAKING COMPANY) [X] 1,2,5,7 * pages 1-2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]NL108224C (GESELLSCHAFT FÜR LINDE'S EISMASCHINEN A.G.) [X] 1,2,6-8 * columns 4-6; figures 2,3; claim . *; | [X]FR2137873 (UNILEVER N.V.) [X] 1-3 * sentence 9; examples 1,2 *; | [X]CA1151369 (NICKERSON &SONS LTD.) [X] 1,6-8 * page 2; figures 1,3-5,7-10; claim 1 * * pages 5-6; claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]JPS60160839 ; | JPS60160839 [ ] | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851225), vol. 009, no. 331, Database accession no. (C - 321), & JP60160839 A 19850822 (NICHIRO GIYOGIYOU KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 40, Database accession no. 85-245680, & JPS60160839 A 19850822 (NICHIRO GYOGO KK) [ ] * abstract * |