EP0879432 - LAYERED RETROREFLECTIVE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALAZZOTTO, Michael, C. 9272 Duckwood Trail Woodbury, MN 55125 / US | 02 /
MAHONEY, Wayne, S. 373 E. Kellogg Boulevard Saint Paul, MN 55101 / US | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96908460.7 | 05.02.1996 | [1998/48] | WO1996US01583 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728470 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879432 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879432 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/128, E01F9/06 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
G02B5/128 (EP);
E01F9/524 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/48] | Title | German: | RETROREFLEKTIERENDE SCHICHTELEMENTE | [2000/14] | English: | LAYERED RETROREFLECTIVE ELEMENTS | [1998/48] | French: | ELEMENTS RETROREFLECHISSANTS EN COUCHES | [1998/48] |
Former [1998/48] | RETROREFLEKTIERENDE SCHICHTELEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DYA]US3418896 (RIDEOUT DONALD C) [DY] 1 * column W * [A] 3-7,17,20,22,23; | [YA]DE1784654 (WIPFLER PIUS A) [Y] 1 * column W * [A] 3-5,9,13,17,20,23; | [A]EP0346021 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1-7,12-17,20,22,23 * column A *; | [A]US4035059 (DEMASTER ROBERT D) [A] 1,3-6,17,20,23,24 * column W * |