EP0834220 - HIGH SPEED, LOW POWER CMOS D/A CONVERTER FOR WAVE SYNTHESIS IN NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINCN, John, Michael P.O. Box 631 Cupertino, CA 95015 / US | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908603.2 | 01.03.1996 | [1998/15] | WO1996US02823 | Priority number, date | US19950482113 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 482113 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641421 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834220 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834220 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/74 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
H03M1/0682 (EP,US);
H03M1/747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/15] | Title | German: | HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-CMOS-D/A-WANDLER NIEDRIGER LEISTUNG ZUR WELLENSYNTHESE IN EINEM NETZ | [1998/15] | English: | HIGH SPEED, LOW POWER CMOS D/A CONVERTER FOR WAVE SYNTHESIS IN NETWORK | [1998/15] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR N/A AVEC CMOS, ULTRA-RAPIDE ET A FAIBLE PUISSANCE POUR LA SYNTHESE D'ONDES DANS UN RESEAU | [1998/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.12.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/22] | FR | 28.05.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5148164 (NAKAMURA YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 5, line 56 - column 8, line 25; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US5254994 (TAKAKURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 35; figures 9,10 *; | [DA]US5357145 (SEGARAM PARA K [US]) [DA] 1-6 * column 8, line 49 - column 11, line 7; figure 7 * |