EP0852477 - A METHOD OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE FOCUSED SURGICAL AND THERAPEUTIC ULTRASOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMARX PHARMACEUTICAL CORP. 1635 East 18th Street Tucson, AZ 85749 / US | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNGER, Evan, C. 13365 East Camino La Cebadilla Tucson, AZ 85749 / US | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908679.2 | 06.03.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996US03054 | Priority number, date | US19950401974 | 09.03.1995 Original published format: US 401974 | US19950476317 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 476317 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628090 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852477 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61B5/055, A61K31/16, A61K49/00, A61K9/50, A61N7/00, A61N7/02 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
G01R33/5601 (EP,US);
A61K41/0028 (EP,US);
A61K41/0052 (EP,US);
A61K47/6911 (EP,US);
A61K47/6913 (EP,US);
A61K47/6925 (EP,US);
A61K49/103 (EP,US);
A61K49/16 (EP,US);
A61K49/1806 (EP,US);
A61K49/1839 (EP,US);
A61K49/1863 (EP,US);
A61K49/1866 (EP,US);
A61K49/1878 (EP,US);
A61K49/22 (EP,US);
A61K49/223 (EP,US);
A61K49/227 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61K9/1277 (EP,US);
A61K9/1278 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/3145 (EP,US);
G01R33/56308 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/29] | A61B5/055, A61B8/00, A61B8/13, A61K49/04, A61K9/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE UND CHIRUGISCHE BEHANDLUNGSMETHODE MIT ULTRASCHALL BASIEREND AUF MAGNETISCHER RESONANZ | [1998/29] | English: | A METHOD OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE FOCUSED SURGICAL AND THERAPEUTIC ULTRASOUND | [1998/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERAPEUTIQUE ET CHIRURGICAL AUX ULTRASONS DIRIGES PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 08.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 03.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/22] | 27.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0467031 (CAVITATION CONTROL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-31 * p.3, l.14-15; p.5, l.33-48; p.6, l.3-7, l.26-55; p.7, l.18-33; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]WO9222249 (UNGER EVAN C [US]) [Y] 1-31 * claims 1-16 *; | [DX]WO9428780 (UNGER EVAN C [US], et al) [DX] 1-31 * p.7, l.23-p.8, l.18; claims 1-9 *; | [PDX]WO9524184 (UNGER EVAN C [US]) [PDX] 1-31* claims 1-68 *; | [Y] - HYNYNEN ET AL, "The usefulness of a contrast agent and GRASS for MRI-guided non-invasive ultrasound surgery", INVEST RADIOL, (199410), vol. 29, no. 10, pages 897 - 03, XP002071781 [Y] 1-31 * abstract; p.902-903, Discussion * | International search | [Y]US4544545 (RYAN PATRICK J [US], et al); | [Y]US5215680 (D ARRIGO JOSEPH S [US]); | [XP]US5469854 (UNGER EVAN C [US], et al) |