EP0815354 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING BLOWOUT IN A GAS TURBINE COMBUSTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCENKO, Michael Apartment 226, 222 Williams Street East Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
VANDERLEEST, Ruurd, Edward 43 Haylin Drive Vernon, CT 06066 / US | 03 /
ST. ONGE, Kenneth, John 17 Tecumseh Road West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908822.8 | 14.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996US03534 | Priority number, date | US19950404474 | 14.03.1995 Original published format: US 404474 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628644 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0815354 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815354 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/14, F01D17/02, F01D17/08, F02C9/28, F02C7/262 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
F01D17/02 (EP,US);
F01D21/14 (EP,KR,US);
F01D17/08 (EP,US);
F02C7/262 (EP,US);
F02C9/28 (EP,US);
F05D2270/092 (EP,US);
F05D2270/301 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG UM BEI EINER GASTURBINENBRENNKAMMER FESTZUSTELLEN OB DIE FLAMMEN AUSGEBLASEN SIND | [1998/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING BLOWOUT IN A GAS TURBINE COMBUSTOR | [1998/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETECTER LES RUPTURES DANS LA CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION D'UNE TURBINE A GAZ | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH08418241 ; | [Y]JPS59213927 ; | [A]FR2189633 (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 9 - line 23 * * page 2, line 31 - line 33 *; | [A]US4454754 (ZAGRANSKI RAYMOND D [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4597259 (MOORE M SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - line 61 *; | [YD]US5170621 (BARNUM B MELVIN [US], et al) [YD] 13-18 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 22; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5235802 (BARNUM B MELVIN [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840519), vol. 8, no. 108, Database accession no. (M - 297)<1545>, & JP8418241 A 19840130 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) [Y] 1-12,13-18 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850413), vol. 009, no. 084, Database accession no. (M - 371), & JP59213927 A 19841203 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1-12,13-18 * abstract * |