EP0820528 - IRON SMELTING PROCESS AND PLANT ACCORDING TO THE MULTIPLE ZONE SMELTING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voest Alpine Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Voest Alpine Industrieanlagenbau Gmbh Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMITROV, Stefan Rintstrasse 8 A-4030 Linz / AT | 02 /
RAMASEDER, Norbert Robert-Stolzstrasse 14 A-4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
PIRKLBAUER, Wilfried Schmidberg 13 A-4491 Niederneukirchen / AT | 04 /
FRITZ, Ernst Scheibenpogenstrasse 61 A-4020 Linz / AT | 05 /
MÜLLER, Heinz Tassilostrasse 1 A-4501 Neuhofen / AT | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Kopecky, Helmut, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Kopecky, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte, et al Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 96908911.9 | 09.04.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996AT00067 | Priority number, date | AT19950000626 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: AT 62695 | [1998/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632505 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820528 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820528 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, C21C5/56, F27B3/08 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
C21C5/5229 (EP,US);
C21C5/52 (KR);
C21C5/5252 (EP,US);
C21C5/56 (KR);
C21C5/562 (EP,US);
F27B3/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON EISENSCHMELZEN NACH DEM MEHRZONENSCHMELZVERFAHREN | [1998/05] | English: | IRON SMELTING PROCESS AND PLANT ACCORDING TO THE MULTIPLE ZONE SMELTING PROCESS | [1998/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE FONTES EN FER SELON LE PROCEDE DE FUSION EN ZONES MULTIPLES | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.11.1999 | FI | 03.11.1999 | GR | 03.11.1999 | NL | 03.11.1999 | SE | 03.11.1999 | DK | 03.02.2000 | PT | 03.02.2000 | AT | 09.04.2000 | LU | 09.04.2000 | BE | 30.04.2000 | CH | 30.04.2000 | LI | 30.04.2000 | IE | 19.07.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
FI | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
FI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
FI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
MC | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
FI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
FI | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | FI | 03.11.1999 | |
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/10] | FI | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
IE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | FI | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 03.11.1999 | |
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | IE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FI | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | IE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FI | 04.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 03.02.2000 | |
FI | 04.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 04.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1482929 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1800131 (CONZINC RIOTINTO LTD) [A] 1,18 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 44; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]AT295566B (CONZINC RIOTINTO LTD [AU]); | [A]EP0074270 (BRITISH STEEL CORP [GB]) [A] 1,18* page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0240485 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [A] 1,18 * abstract *; | [A]FR2611876 (CLECIM SA [FR]) [A] 1,18 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0548041 (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT]) [A] 1,18 * abstract * |