EP0839364 - COIN VALIDATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COIN CONTROLS LIMITED New Coin Street Royton Oldham Lancashire OL2 6JZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states COIN CONTROLS LIMITED New Coin Street Royton Oldham Lancashire OL2 6JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOD, Dennis Horest Cottage, Horest Lane, Denshaw Oldham, Lancashire OL3 5SU / GB | 02 /
BELL, Malcolm, Reginald, Hallas 9 Foxhill Green, Westwood Leeds LS16 5PQ / GB | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96909227.9 | 02.04.1996 | [1998/19] | WO1996GB00804 | Priority number, date | GB19950014459 | 14.07.1995 Original published format: GB 9514459 | GB19950022455 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9522455 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704424 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0839364 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839364 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07D5/08 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G07D5/08 (EP,US);
G07D5/00 (KR);
G07D5/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/19] | G07D5/08, G07F3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/19] | Title | German: | MÜNZPRÜFER | [1998/19] | English: | COIN VALIDATOR | [1998/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VALIDATION DE PIECES | [1998/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.12.2002 | IT | 04.12.2002 | DE | 05.03.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 04.12.2002 | |
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | DE | 05.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9209056 (COIN CONTROLS [GB]) [X] 1-33 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2724868 (WALTER HANKE MECH WERKSTAETTEN) [A] 1-33 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9306569 (COIN CONTROLS [GB]) [A] 1-33 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0373948 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-33 * figures 1,5; claim 1 *; | [A]US4474281 (ROBERTS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * figures 2,3; claim 1 * | Examination | GB1405936 |