EP0819252 - RAPID ASSAYS FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF ORGAN STATUS BASED ON THE DETECTION OF ONE OR MORE ISOENZYMES OF GLUTATHIONE S-TRANSFERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotrin Intellectual Properties Limited 93 The Rise Mount Merrion County Dublin / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Biotrin Intellectual Properties Limited 93 The Rise Mount Merrion, County Dublin / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOYLE, John, Martin 27 Kill Abbey Deansgrange, County Dublin / IE | 02 /
KILTY, Cormac, Gerard 34 Dundela Park Sandycove, County Dublin / IE | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Anne Mary Anne Ryan & Co 2 Crofton Terrace Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Ryan, Anne Mary c/o Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 96909321.0 | 02.04.1996 | [1998/04] | WO1996IE00019 | Priority number, date | WO1995IE00024 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: PCT/IE95/00024 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631779 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819252 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819252 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/573, G01N33/558, G01N33/548, G01N33/58 | [1998/04] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/04] | Title | German: | SCHNELLE ASSAYS ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES ORGANZUSTANDS BASIEREND AUF DEM NACHWEIS EINES ODER MEHRERER ISOENZYME VON GLUTATHION-S-TRANSFERASE | [1999/47] | English: | RAPID ASSAYS FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF ORGAN STATUS BASED ON THE DETECTION OF ONE OR MORE ISOENZYMES OF GLUTATHIONE S-TRANSFERASE | [1998/04] | French: | DOSAGES RAPIDES POUR L'EVALUATION DE L'ETAT D'UN ORGANE PAR DETECTION D'UNE OU PLUSIEURS ISOENZYMES DE GLUTATHION-S-TRANSFERASE | [1998/04] |
Former [1998/04] | SCHNELLE ASSAYS ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DES ORGANZUSTANDS GEGRÜNDET AUF DEM NACHWEIS EINER ODER MEHRER ISOENZYMEN VON GLUTATHION-S-TRANSFERASE | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.1999 | GR | 24.11.1999 | NL | 24.11.1999 | SE | 24.11.1999 | DK | 24.02.2000 | PT | 24.02.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/46] | FI | 24.11.1999 | |
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
DK | 24.02.2000 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 24.11.1999 | |
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
MC | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 24.11.1999 | |
NL | 24.11.1999 | ||
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | FI | 24.11.1999 | |
SE | 24.11.1999 | ||
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 24.11.1999 | |
PT | 24.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 24.02.2000 | |
FI | 25.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 25.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [D]EP0291194 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [Y]WO9012088 (US ARMY [US]) [Y] 3* page 11, line 7 - line 28 *; | [Y]EP0560410 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [Y] 1-12 * page 11, lines 1-56 * * page 13, lines 10-23 *; | [Y]WO9322452 (KILTY CORMAC GERARD [IE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * |