EP0765738 - PLATY OR MOLDED MATERIAL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states Onnetsu Kankyo Kaihatsu Inc. 2-8, Nishimachi Kita-2-chome Nishiku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 063 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toa Shoji Co., Ltd. 31-8, Takadanobaba 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 169 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUBOSHI, Hiroshi 6-35, Sumikawa 5-jo 11-chome Minami-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 005 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Atsushi 7-7, Misumicho 2-chome Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189 / JP | 03 /
NISHIYAMA, Toshiaki 8-34, Saiwai 2-chome Otaru-shi Hokkaido 047 / JP | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/14] | Vossius, Tilman, et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96909357.4 | 11.04.1996 | [1997/14] | WO1996JP01013 | Priority number, date | JP19950111134 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: JP 11113495 | JP19950286617 | 06.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28661795 | [1997/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632251 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765738 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B21/02 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
B32B9/02 (EP);
B32B5/26 (US);
B27N3/12 (EP);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/024 (US);
D04H1/425 (EP);
D04H1/4374 (EP);
D04H1/593 (EP);
E04C2/16 (EP);
E04C2/24 (EP);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2262/065 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL, SE [1997/14] | Title | German: | PLÄTCHENFÖRMIGES ODER GEFORMTES MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1997/14] | English: | PLATY OR MOLDED MATERIAL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1997/14] | French: | ARTICLE STRATIFIE OU MOULE ET PROCEDE POUR LE FABRIQUER | [1997/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1996 | Translation filed | 17.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 02.03.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS4826144Y ; | [A]JPS5139780 (SHIGERU KOGYO KK); | [A]JPS6099650U ; | [A]JPH05177761 (SUZUKI SOGYO KK) |