EP0820438 - O-CARBAMOYL-PHENYLALANINOL HAVING SUBSTITUENT AT BENZENE RING, ITS PHARMACEUTICALLY USEFUL SALTS AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Corporation 99, Seorin dong, Jongro-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states SK Corporation 99, Seorin dong, Jongro-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states YUKONG LIMITED 26-4 Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Yong, Moon 2, Van Duyne Court Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | 02 /
HAN, Dong, Il Se-Jong Apartment 108-342 Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon 305-390 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yong, Kil Se-Jong Apartment 109-601 Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon 305-390 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Hun, Woo Se-Jong Apartment 107-302 Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon 305-390 / KR | [1998/37] |
Former [1998/05] | 01 /
CHOI, Yong, Moon 2, Van Duyne Court Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | ||
02 /
HAN, Dong, Il Se-Jong Apartment 110-403 Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon 305-390 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Yong, Kil Se-Jong Apartment 109-601 Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon 305-390 / KR | |||
04 /
SHIN, Hun, Woo Se-Jong Apartment 107-302 Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku Taejon 305-390 / KR | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/05] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96909388.9 | 10.04.1996 | [1998/05] | WO1996KR00051 | Priority number, date | KR19950008310 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: KR 9508310 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632375 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820438 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820438 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/10, C07C269/00 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
C07C271/12 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (KR);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
C07C269/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | O-CARBAMOYL-PHENYLALANINOL DAS EINEN SUBSTITUENTEN AM BENZOLRING TRÄGT, SEINE PHARMAZEUTISCH ANWENDBAREN SALZE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/25] | English: | O-CARBAMOYL-PHENYLALANINOL HAVING SUBSTITUENT AT BENZENE RING, ITS PHARMACEUTICALLY USEFUL SALTS AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME | [1998/05] | French: | O-CARBAMOYLPHENYLALANINOL AYANT UN SUBSTITUANT AU NIVEAU DU CYCLE BENZENIQUE, SES SELS UTILES SUR LE PLAN PHARMACEUTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1998/05] |
Former [1998/05] | O-CARBAMOYL-PHENYLALANINOL DAS EINEN SUBSTITUENTEN AM BENZOLRING TRÄGT, SEINE PHARMAZEUTISCH ANWENDBARE SALZE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 28.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1434826 (GALLARDO ANTONIO SA); | [A]US5306842 (IKARIYA TAKAO [JP], et al) |