EP0879363 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OBTAINING A FREE DISPERSE SYSTEM IN LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kozyuk, Oleg Vyacheslavovich 14600 Brookpark Road Cleveland, OH 44135 / US | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96909495.2 | 20.02.1996 | [1998/48] | WO1996US02304 | Priority number, date | US19960602069 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: US 602069 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730292 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879363 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879363 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F15D1/02, B01F3/04 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
F15D1/02 (EP,US);
B01F25/4421 (EP,US);
B01F23/4105 (EP,US);
B01F25/42 (EP,US);
B01F25/433 (EP,US);
B01F25/4335 (EP,US);
B01F25/434 (EP,US);
B01F25/4413 (EP,US);
B01F25/45 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FREI DISPERSEN SYSTEMS IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [1998/48] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OBTAINING A FREE DISPERSE SYSTEM IN LIQUID | [1998/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'OBTENTION D'UN SYSTEME A DISPERSION LIBRE DANS UN LIQUIDE | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | BE | 11.09.2002 | CH | 11.09.2002 | GR | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | PT | 17.12.2002 | IE | 20.02.2003 | LU | 20.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
IE | 20.02.2003 | ||
LU | 20.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
IE | 20.02.2003 | ||
LU | 20.02.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
IE | 20.02.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 11.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1766477 ; | [A]SU1287928 ; | [DX]US3834982 (BELONOGOV A, et al) [DX] 1-29 * abstract *; | [X]US4014524 (KLINGEBIEL WARD JOHN) [X] 1,2,5,9-13,16,19,23-26,29 * column 6, line 37 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0644271 (KOZJUK OLEG VYACHESLAVOVICH [UA], et al) [X] 1-29 * figures 1-3; example 1 *; | US5492654 [ ] (KOZJUK OLEG V [UA], et al); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 39, Database accession no. 93-310965, XP002095764 & SU1766477 A 19921007 (MOSC AVIATION INST) [A] 1,16,29 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 37, Database accession no. 87-262992, XP002095765 & SU1287928 A 19870207 (KIROV POLY) [A] 1,16,29 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US830338 (LEDOUX JOHN W [US]); | [X]US1892906 ; | [A]US5085058 (AARON DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US5341848 (LAWS ELIZABETH M [GB]); | [XE]US5492654 (KOZJUK OLEG V [UA], et al) | by applicant | JPS4540634B | US3834982 | US4464057 | US5145256 |