EP0814708 - SOFT TISSUE ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/02] | SOFT TISSUE ANCHOR AND METHOD | ||
[2003/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. 700 Orthopaedic Drive, P.O. Box 988 Warsaw, Indiana 46581-0988 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. 700 Orthopaedics Drive, P.O. Box 988 Warsaw, Indiana 46581-0988 / US | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC. 700 Orthopaedic Drive, P.O. Box 988 Warsaw, Indiana 46581-0988 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOWER, Jerry, L. 350 18th Road Bourbon, IN 46504 / US | 02 /
GOBLE, E., Marlowe 850 East 1200 North Logan, UT 84341 / US | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Jany, Peter, et al Jany und Petersen Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Karlstrasse 87 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Jany, Peter, et al Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany Patentanwälte Beiertheimer Allee 19 D-76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 96909664.3 | 12.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996US03343 | Priority number, date | US19950403070 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: US 403070 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628100 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814708 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814708 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61F2/08 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/1615 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/044 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0458 (EP,US);
A61F2/0805 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0829 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | A61B17/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/02] | Title | German: | WEICHGEWEBEVERANKERUNG | [2003/34] | English: | SOFT TISSUE ANCHOR | [2003/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE D'UN TISSU MOU | [2003/34] |
Former [1998/02] | WEICHGEWEBEVERANKERUNG UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [1998/02] | SOFT TISSUE ANCHOR AND METHOD | ||
Former [1998/02] | DISPOSITIF ET METHODE D'ANCRAGE D'UN TISSU MOU | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 26.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4632100 (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,12,13,18 * column 8, line 15 - line 42; figure 5B * [A] 10; | [A]WO8701270 (ACUFEX MICROSURGICAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [XP]US5411523 (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US]); | [Y]DE3538593 (JUNGEBLOD THOMAS DR MED); | [Y]SU827050 (KZ NII TRAVMATOLOG ORTOPED [SU]); | [Y]US5100417 (CERIER JEFFREY C [US], et al); | [Y]US5324308 (PIERCE JAVIN [US]); | [Y]US5246441 (ROSS RANDALL D [US], et al); | [Y]WO8809157 (MITEK SURGICAL PROD [US]); | [A]US5156616 (MEADOWS BRUCE F [US], et al); | [A]US5354298 (LEE DANIEL R [US], et al); | [Y]US5013316 (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US], et al) |