EP0879424 - RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Escort Memory Systems 104 Whispering Pines Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMBERTO, Calari Via Mengolia, 5 I-40138 Bologna / IT | 02 /
LAMPKIN, Mark, C. 386 Merriweather Gross Pointe Farms, MI 48236 / US | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1998/48] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife Beacon House 113 Kingsway London WC2B 6PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96909857.3 | 22.03.1996 | [1998/48] | WO1996US04032 | Priority number, date | US19950415853 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: US 415853 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631787 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879424 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879424 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/02, H01Q1/42 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
G06K7/10346 (EP,US);
G06K7/10316 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US);
H01Q3/04 (EP,US);
G01S13/758 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/48] | Title | German: | RADIOFREQUENZIDENTIFIZIERUNGSLESEGERÄT | [1998/48] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION READER | [1998/48] | French: | LECTEUR D'IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIOFREQUENCES | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.12.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 | 08.12.1997 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 | 08.12.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 | 08.12.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 | 08.12.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 | 08.12.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 | 08.12.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.07.2001 | CH | 25.07.2001 | LI | 25.07.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2002/29] | BE | 25.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4178592 (MCKEE MAUREEN K [US]); | [Y]US4831438 (BELLMAN JR ALFRED H [US], et al); | [XY]US5387916 (COHN MARVIN [US]) |