EP0814744 - THERAPY AND TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hassler, Andreas Ranhartstetten 10 83101 Rohrdorf / DE | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states SQ Services AG Sumpfstrasse 5 CH-6312 Steinhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
HASSLER, Andreas Ranhartstetten 6 D-83101 Rohrdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Böck, Bernhard, et al advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Böck, Bernhard, et al Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/02] | Böck, Bernhard, et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Postfach 63 05 97013 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96910001.5 | 20.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996EP01209 | Priority number, date | DE1995109465 | 20.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19509465 | DE1995131833 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19531833 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9629040 | Date: | 26.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814744 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814744 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
A63B23/0417 (EP,US);
A61H1/024 (EP,US);
A61H1/0259 (EP,US);
A63B21/0004 (EP,US);
A63B21/0552 (EP,US);
A63B21/4011 (EP,US);
A63B21/4015 (EP,US);
A63B21/4025 (EP,US);
A63B23/03516 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1215 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1276 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1642 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A63B21/00069 (EP,US);
A63B21/0428 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1998/02] | Title | German: | THERAPIE- UND TRAININGSGERÄT | [1998/02] | English: | THERAPY AND TRAINING DEVICE | [1998/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE THERAPIE ET D'ENTRAINEMENT | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2772881 (JANE FUNDOM DORIS) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 46 - line 66; figure - *; | [A]EP0057609 (NAUTILUS SPORTS MED IND [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2096006 (IND ENERGY SPECIALISTS INC) [X] 1,33 * abstract *; | [A]US4569336 (WHEELER JUDE [US]) [A] 1* column A *; | [AY]US4930497 (SARINGER JOHN H [CA]) [A] 2,5,9,10,17,18,22 * column 3, line 5 - line 33; figure - * [Y] 34; | [XY]WO9304655 (PREST CRAIG [GB]) [X] 1,33,37 * page 7, line 1 - line 29; figure 1 * [Y] 34 |