EP0835209 - APPLYING STRETCH LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B & H MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. 3461 Roeding Road Ceres California 95307 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states B & H MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. 3461 Roeding Road Ceres California 95307 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIGHT, Lyn, E. 3625 Lockwood Road Ceres, CA 95307 / US | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96910742.4 | 03.04.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996US04641 | Priority number, date | US19950495982 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: US 495982 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701484 | Date: | 16.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835209 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835209 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/00, B65C3/08, B65C3/16 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
B65C3/08 (EP,US);
B65C9/00 (KR);
B65C3/16 (EP,US);
B65C9/0015 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0021 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1033 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | B65C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON DEHNBAREN ETIKETTEN | [1998/16] | English: | APPLYING STRETCH LABELS | [1998/16] | French: | APPLICATION D'ETIQUETTES ELASTIQUES | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 14.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | BE | 11.09.2002 | CH | 11.09.2002 | FI | 11.09.2002 | GR | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | NL | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | PT | 17.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | IE | 03.04.2003 | LU | 03.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
IE | 03.04.2003 | ||
LU | 03.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
IE | 03.04.2003 | ||
LU | 03.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
IE | 03.04.2003 | ||
LU | 03.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
IE | 03.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 11.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3235433 (CVACHO DANIEL S, et al) [Y] 9-11,13 * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 7 *; | [X]US4416714 (HOFFMANN WOLFGANG [US]) [X] 1-8,12,14-19* column 6, line 2 - line 4 *; | [XY]WO9414611 (B & H MFG CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12,14-19 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 2 * [Y] 9-11,13 | International search | [Y]US4216044 (HERDZINA FRANK J [US], et al); | [Y]US4923557 (DICKEY DANIEL M [US]); | [A]US5091239 (PRZEWORSKI RICHARD A [US], et al) | Examination | WO9640559 |