EP0821674 - CYCLIC AMIDINO AGENTS USEFUL AS NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D. Searle & Co. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states G.D. SEARLE & CO. Corporate Patent Department P.O. Box 5110 Chicago, IL 60680-5110 / US | ||
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states G.D. SEARLE & CO. Corporate Patent Department P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Donald, W., Jr. 5250 West Brown Street Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 02 /
HALLINAN, E., Ann 135 Barton Avenue Evanston, IL 60202 / US | 03 /
HAGEN, Timothy, J. 1920 Madison Avenue Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 04 /
KRAMER, Steven, W. 8831 Kenneth Drive, 1A Des Plaines, IL 60016 / US | 05 /
METZ, Suzanne 525 Westernmill Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 06 /
PETERSON, Karen, B. 340 Ashwood Court Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 07 /
SPANGLER, Dale, P. 30 Kimberly Court Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | 08 /
TOTH, Mihaly, V. 1031 Claridge Place St. Louis, MO 63122 / US | 09 /
FOK, Kam, F. 13196 Strawberry Way St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | 10 /
BERGMANIS, Arija, A. 2149 Westview Drive Des Plaines, IL 60018 / US | 11 /
WEBBER, R., Keith 1702 Fairwood Forest Drive St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 12 /
TRIVEDI, Mahima 2600 Gold Road nr. 410 Glenview, IL 60025 / US | 13 /
TJOENG, Foe, S. 875 Sugar Hill Drive Manchester, MO 63021 / US | 14 /
PITZELE, Barnett, S. 7924 North Tripp Avenue Skokie, IL 60076 / US | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/06] | Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96910833.1 | 19.04.1996 | [1998/06] | WO1996US05315 | Priority number, date | US19950425831 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: US 425831 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9633175 | Date: | 24.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0821674 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821674 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/12, A61K31/55, C07D405/06, C07D409/06, C07D207/14, C07D225/02, C07D211/72, C07D413/06, C07D403/06, C07D401/12 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D223/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D207/22 (EP,US);
C07D211/72 (EP,US);
C07D225/02 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/06] | Title | German: | ZYCLISCHE AMIDINO MITTEL ALS STICKSTOFFOXID-SYNTHASE INHIBITOREN | [1998/06] | English: | CYCLIC AMIDINO AGENTS USEFUL AS NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE INHIBITORS | [1998/06] | French: | AGENTS AMIDINO CYCLIQUES UTILES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE SYNTHASE DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE | [1998/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 11.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Request for further processing for: | 26.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2003 | BE | 06.08.2003 | CH | 06.08.2003 | FI | 06.08.2003 | LI | 06.08.2003 | NL | 06.08.2003 | DK | 06.11.2003 | GR | 06.11.2003 | SE | 06.11.2003 | PT | 06.01.2004 | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
CH | 06.08.2003 | ||
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
DK | 06.11.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
PT | 06.01.2004 | ||
LU | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
CH | 06.08.2003 | ||
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
DK | 06.11.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
PT | 06.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
CH | 06.08.2003 | ||
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
DK | 06.11.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
BE | 06.08.2003 | ||
CH | 06.08.2003 | ||
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
CH | 06.08.2003 | ||
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
LI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
SE | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 06.08.2003 | |
FI | 06.08.2003 | ||
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
GR | 06.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 06.08.2003 | |
NL | 06.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 06.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9313055 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [AD] 1* claim 1 *; | [DYX]WO9412165 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB], et al) [DY] 1 * see formulae (IA) and (IC) * [X] 1; | [YD]WO9414780 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB], et al) [YD] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [PX]WO9511231 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1 * see claim 1 and Examples 263, 272, 301, 302 *; | [X] - M. LANGLOIS ET AL., "Synthèse de nouvelles amidines bicycliques. 1. Dérivés de l'imidazole, du triazole-1,3,4 et du tétrazole", J. HETEROCYCLIC CHEM., (1982), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 193 - 200, XP002009271 [X] 1 * see compound 10 * |