EP0821568 - AN APPARATUS FOR ULTRASOUND GUIDED REMOVAL OF TISSUE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/06] | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR THE INSERTION OF A NEEDLE GUIDE INTO A PATIENT IN ORDER TO REMOVE TISSUE SAMPLES | ||
[2004/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B-K Medical ApS Mileparken 34 2730 Herlev / DK | [2005/28] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states B-K Medical A/S Mileparken 32-34 2730 Herlev / DK | ||
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states B & K Ultrasound Systems A/S Sandtoften 9 2820 Gentofte / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Niels, Stengaard Bringev nget 33 DK-3500 V rl se / DK | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Siiger, Joergen, et al c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Siiger, Joergen, et al c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 96910913.1 | 19.04.1996 | [1998/06] | WO1996DK00177 | Priority number, date | DK19950000453 | 19.04.1995 Original published format: DK 45395 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632889 | Date: | 24.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0821568 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821568 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, A61B10/00, // A61B5/06 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
A61B10/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B2010/045 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00292 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/06] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL GESTÜTZTES BIOPSIEGERÄT | [2004/49] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR ULTRASOUND GUIDED REMOVAL OF TISSUE SAMPLES | [2004/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE BIOPSIE ULTRASONIQUE | [2004/49] |
Former [1998/06] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSATZ EINER NADELFÜHRUNG IN EINEN PATIENTEN ZUR ENTNAHME VON GEWEBE-PROBEN | ||
Former [1998/06] | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR THE INSERTION OF A NEEDLE GUIDE INTO A PATIENT IN ORDER TO REMOVE TISSUE SAMPLES | ||
Former [1998/06] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE UN GUIDE D'AIGUILLE CHEZ UN PATIENT AFIN DE PRELEVER DES ECHANTILLONS DE TISSUS | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 13.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 10.04.2003 | Appeal received No. T0718/03 | 10.04.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.05.2004 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/21] | 01.07.2004 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/27] | 09.07.2004 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/28] | 09.08.2004 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/33] | 15.09.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2005 | BE | 27.07.2005 | CH | 27.07.2005 | LI | 27.07.2005 | NL | 27.07.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | ES | 07.11.2005 | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
SE | 27.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4763662 (YOKOI TAKESHI [JP]); | [A]US4911173 (TERWILLIGER RICHARD A [US]); | [Y]US5256149 (BANIK MICHAEL S [US], et al) |