EP0824434 - A CONVEYOR DEVICE RUNNING ON RAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKAKO A/S Bygmestervej 2 DK-5600 Faaborg / DK | [1998/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JESPERSEN, Herbert, Gottrup Hojeloft Vaenge 52 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Wittrup, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard, Lehmann & Ree A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 96911936.1 | 25.04.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996DK00186 | Priority number, date | DK19950000482 | 25.04.1995 Original published format: DK 48295 | DK19950001433 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: DK 143395 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9633897 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824434 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0824434 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61B13/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
B61B13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHIENEN GEBUNDENE TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG | [1998/09] | English: | A CONVEYOR DEVICE RUNNING ON RAILS | [1998/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF TRANSPORTEUR SUR RAILS | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.1996 | Translation filed | 27.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 26.11.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.1999 | BE | 11.08.1999 | CH | 11.08.1999 | GR | 11.08.1999 | LI | 11.08.1999 | PT | 11.11.1999 | IE | 25.04.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2001/50] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
IE | 25.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
CH | 11.08.1999 | ||
LI | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
CH | 16.11.1999 | ||
LI | 16.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | ||
PT | 11.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 11.08.1999 | |
BE | 11.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3540380 (TUMPAK JOHN S, et al); | [A]WO8300466 (FLYDA LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2157636 (TOSHIBA KK) |