EP0823089 - AUTOMATIC PARALLEL ELECTRONIC COMPONENT TESTING METHOD AND EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [1999/23] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES S.A. 50, avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURNEL, Jean-Claude Le Bourg F-43140 Saint-Victor Malescours / FR | 02 /
CHAUSSE, Daniel 5, rue Joly-Gilly F-42100 Saint-Etienne / FR | 03 /
MURGUE, Jean-Louis La Planchette F-42660 Saint-Romain-les-Atheux / FR | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Lemoyne, Didier Schlumberger Industries Propriété Intellectuelle 50 Avenue Jean Jaurès BP 620-04 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Lemoyne, Didier Schlumberger Industries, Propriété Intellectuelle, 50, avenue Jean Jaurès, BP 620-04 92542 Montrouge-Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96912093.0 | 10.04.1996 | [1998/07] | WO1996FR00541 | Priority number, date | FR19950004776 | 19.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9504776 | [1998/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9633461 | Date: | 24.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823089 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823089 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26, G01R31/28, G06F11/273 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
G01R31/2834 (EP,US);
G01R31/31908 (EP,US);
G01R31/31926 (EP,US);
G01R31/31922 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PARALLELEN AUTOMATISCHEN PRÜFUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTUNGEN | [1998/07] | English: | AUTOMATIC PARALLEL ELECTRONIC COMPONENT TESTING METHOD AND EQUIPMENT | [1998/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT DE TEST AUTOMATIQUE EN PARALLELE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES | [1998/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0446550 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * claims 1,2,8-11 *; | [A] - KING P.N., "Flexible, high-performance pin electronics implementation", INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE 1989, WASHINGTON, USA, (19890829), pages 787 - 794, XP000090010 [A] 1-4 * page 788, column 1, line 10 - page 790, column 1, line 33 * * figure 1 * |