EP0846146 - COLORANT STABILIZING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/24] | NOVEL COLORANTS AND COLORANT MODIFIERS | ||
[2000/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOHR, Ronald, Sinclair 8955 Nesbit Lakes Drive Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | 02 /
MacDONALD, John, Gavin 1472 Knollwood Terrace Decatur, GA 30033 / US | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96912579.8 | 05.04.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996US04689 | Priority number, date | US19950000057P | 28.06.1995 Original published format: US 57 P | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9701605 | Date: | 16.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846146 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846146 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/00, C07C69/94, C07C69/773, C07C65/38 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
C09B67/0075 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (EP,US);
B41M5/284 (EP,US);
B41M5/46 (EP,US);
B41M7/0009 (EP,US);
B43M11/08 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C49/217 (EP,US);
C07C49/796 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C51/347 (EP,US);
C07C51/60 (EP,US);
C07C65/38 (EP,US);
C07C69/76 (EP,US);
C07C69/94 (EP,US);
C08B37/0012 (EP,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C09B67/0071 (EP,US);
C09B67/0092 (EP,US);
C09D105/16 (EP,US);
C09D11/17 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (EP,US);
G03G9/08 (EP,US);
G03G9/0825 (EP,US);
G03G9/08777 (EP,US);
G03G9/0906 (EP,US);
G03G9/0926 (EP,US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G9/09733 (EP,US);
G03G9/09741 (EP,US);
G03G9/0975 (EP,US);
G03G9/09758 (EP,US);
G03G9/09775 (EP,US);
G03G9/09791 (EP,US);
G06K1/121 (EP,US);
G06K19/06046 (EP,US);
G09F3/0294 (EP,US);
B41M3/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/71, C07C49/84 (US,EP);
C07C51/347, C07C65/38 (EP,US);
C07C51/60, C07C65/38 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/24] | Title | German: | FARBSTOFFSTABILISIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2000/45] | English: | COLORANT STABILIZING COMPOSITION | [2000/45] | French: | COMPOSITION COLORANTE STABILISEE | [2000/45] |
Former [1998/24] | NEUE FARBSTOFFE UND FARBSTOFFMODIFIZIERUNGSMITTEL | ||
Former [1998/24] | NOVEL COLORANTS AND COLORANT MODIFIERS | ||
Former [1998/24] | COLORANTS ET MODIFICATEURS NOUVEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2001 | BE | 26.09.2001 | FI | 26.09.2001 | NL | 26.09.2001 | DK | 26.12.2001 | PT | 26.12.2001 | GR | 28.12.2001 | LU | 05.04.2002 | MC | 05.04.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
FI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
DK | 26.12.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
LU | 05.04.2002 | ||
MC | 05.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
FI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
DK | 26.12.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
MC | 05.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
FI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
MC | 05.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
FI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | BE | 26.09.2001 | |
FI | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 26.09.2001 | |
FI | 26.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 26.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS62100557 ; | [Y]FR2245010 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 24 *; | [Y]FR2383157 (BIOREX LABORATORIES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 1 - line 27 *; | [A]WO9504955 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9622335 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [E] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871014), vol. 011, no. 315, Database accession no. (C - 451), & JP62100557 A 19870511 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |