EP0817949 - CERAMIC HEAT EXCHANGER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turbosonic Technologies, Inc. 11 Melanie Lane, Unit 22A East Hanover New Jersey 07936 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Sonic Environmental Systems, Inc. 141 New Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCKWOOD, Hanford, N. 2222 Alameda de las Pulgas San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96912760.4 | 09.04.1996 | [1998/03] | WO1996US05173 | Priority number, date | US19950422097 | 14.04.1995 Original published format: US 422097 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9632617 | Date: | 17.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817949 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/06, F28F9/02, F28F21/04, F16L15/02 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
F28F9/06 (EP,US);
F28F21/04 (EP,US);
F28F9/0229 (EP,US);
Y10S165/052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, GB, NL, SE [1998/03] | Title | German: | KERAMISCHER WÄRMETAUSCHER | [1998/03] | English: | CERAMIC HEAT EXCHANGER SYSTEM | [1998/03] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR EN CERAMIQUE | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 05.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6062592 ; | [Y]US3504739 (PEARCE ROY GEORGE) [Y] 29-32 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4122894 (LAWS WILLIAM R, et al) [A] 1-28 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [XAY]GB1590918 (HAGUE INT) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 73 - page 7, line 85; figures 1-10 * [A] 5-16,18-28 [Y] 17,29-32; | [A]EP0037243 (LAWS WILLIAM ROBERT [GB], et al) [A] 1-28* page 10, line 9 - page 21, line 24; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0118103 (GRAHAM ROBERT G) [A] 1-28 * page 4, line 33 - page 7, line 34; figures 1-5 *; | [XAY]EP0190701 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 11, line 8 - page 31, line 19; figures 1-13 * [A] 3-16,18-32 [Y] 17 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850815), vol. 009, no. 198, Database accession no. (M - 404), & JP60062592 A 19850410 (NIHON GAISHI KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 5-28 | International search | [Y]US3263747 (GORDON MCKAY); | [Y]US3504739 (PEARCE ROY GEORGE); | [A]US4332295 (LAHAYE PAUL G, et al); | [X]US4360057 (KOUMP VALENTIN); | [Y]US5160176 (GALE EDWIN J [US]) | [Y] - ADVANCES IN CERAMICS, Volume 14, c. 1985, ROBERT G. GRAHAM, "Vertical Tube-Style, All-Ceramic, Air-to-Air Heat Exchanger", from, "CERAMICS IN HEAT EXCHANGERS", pps. 97-101. | by applicant | GB191175 | US3923314 | US4106556 | US4122894 | GB2015146 | US4449575 | US4632181 |