EP0825829 - HIGH RESOLUTION INTRAVASCULAR SIGNAL DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. MS-300, 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states CARDIMA, INC. 47266 Benecia Street Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITTMANN, Laszlo 1000 Blythe Boulevard Charlotte, NC 28232 / US | 02 /
LAU, Liming 501 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
AMIRANA, Omar Unit 5C 365 Forest Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/10] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96913372.7 | 08.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996US06631 | Priority number, date | US19950443657 | 18.05.1995 Original published format: US 443657 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636277 | Date: | 21.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825829 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/042 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B17/22012 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/10] | Title | German: | SIGNALDETEKTION MIT HOHER AUFLÖSUNG IN BLUTGEFÄSSEN | [1998/10] | English: | HIGH RESOLUTION INTRAVASCULAR SIGNAL DETECTION | [1998/10] | French: | DETECTION DE SIGNAUX INTRAVASCULAIRES A HAUTE RESOLUTION | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/05] | 10.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/05] | 02.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0366127 (BIOMED TECH FORSCHUNGSGES [DE]) [A] 1,16,17,22 * column A; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0499491 (CARDIAC PATHWAYS CORP [US]) [A] 1,16,17,22* column W *; | [A]WO9320750 (CARDIORHYTHM [US]) [A] 1,9-12,32,33 * abstract *; | [DXA]WO9416619 (CARDIMA INC [US]) [DX] 16 * the whole document * [A] 1-15,17-36; | [XA]WO9509561 (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 16 * abstract * * page 9, line 21 - page 17, line 26 * * page 24, line 5 - page 25, line 30 * [A] 1-6,13-15,17-31,34-36 |