EP0824749 - IMPROVING THE RELIABILITY OF WORD RECOGNIZERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audio Navigation Systems, LLC 6611 Odessa Avenue Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | [1998/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LA RUE, Charles 1432 Olive Lane La Canada, CA 91356 / US | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 96913950.0 | 07.05.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996US06401 | Priority number, date | US19950437057 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: US 437057 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9636042 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824749 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06, G10L9/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
B60R16/0373 (EP,US);
G10L15/04 (KR);
G01C21/36 (EP,US);
G10L15/08 (EP,US);
G10L15/187 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/09] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT VON SPRACHERKENNERN | [1998/09] | English: | IMPROVING THE RELIABILITY OF WORD RECOGNIZERS | [1998/09] | French: | AMELIORATION DE LA FIABILITE D'UN SYSTEME DE RECONNAISSANCE DES MOTS | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 11.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/11] | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]US4164025 (DUBNOWSKI JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 5, line 23 - column 10, line 5; figure 1 * [X] 11,12; | [AX]US4355302 (ALDEFELD BERND, et al) [A] 1,5,7 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 10 * [X] 11,12; | [X]WO9209866 (AUDIO NAVIGAT SYST INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9416437 (AUDIO NAVIGAT SYST INC [US]) [A] 1,7,11 * the whole document *; | [A] - COLE R ET AL, "SPEAKER-INDEPENDENT RECOGNITION OF SPOKEN ENGLISH LETTERS", INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS (IJCNN), SAN DIEGO, JUNE 17 - 21, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900617), vol. 2, pages 45 - 51, XP000144322 [A] 1,7,11 * the whole document * | [A] - YU C K ET AL, "A PROBABILITY DECISION CRITERION FOR SPEECH RECOGNITION", COMPUTER SPEECH AND LANGUAGE, (19910101), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 11 - 17, XP000203161 [A] 1,7,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0885-2308(91)90015-I | International search | [A]US4866778 (BAKER JAMES K [US]); | [A]US4489435 (MOSHIER STEPHEN L [US]); | [A]USRE32012E ; | [A]US4277644 (LEVINSON STEPHEN E, et al); | [A]US4242731 (MIZOTE MASANORI [JP], et al) |