EP0824341 - PREVENTION OF TOOTH LOSS BY THE ADMINISTRATION OF ALENDRONATE OR ITS SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YATES, Ashley, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
KARPF, David, B. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96913967.4 | 08.05.1996 | [1998/09] | WO1996US06505 | Priority number, date | US19950439749 | 12.05.1995 Original published format: US 439749 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635407 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0824341 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K31/66 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/663 (EP,US);
A61K8/55 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | A61K7/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/09] | Title | German: | VORBEUGUNG GEGEN ZAHNVERLUST DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON ALENDRONAT ODER DESSEN SALZE | [1998/09] | English: | PREVENTION OF TOOTH LOSS BY THE ADMINISTRATION OF ALENDRONATE OR ITS SALTS | [1998/09] | French: | PREVENTION DES PERTES DE DNETS PAR L'ADMINISTRATION D'ALENDRONATE OU DE SES SELS | [1998/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/13] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0449405 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-9* page 4, lines 31-32; example 1 *; | [DX]US5270365 (GERTZ BARRY J [US], et al) [DX] 1-9 * claims 1,4,9 *; | [X]WO9414455 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 9, lines 6-16; claims 1,2,15 *; | [Y]WO9421266 (LEIRAS OY [FI]) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 9; claims 9,10 *; | [PX]WO9528145 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1-9 * example 4; claim - *; | [E]WO9729754 (BINDERMAN ITZHAK [IL], et al) [E] 1-9 * claim - *; | [PX] - YAFFE A ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF BISPHOSPHONATE ON ALVEOLAR BONE RESORPTION FOLLOWING MUCOPERIOSTEAL FLAP SURGERY IN THE MANDIBLE OF RATS", JOURNAL OF PERIODONTOLOGY, (199511), vol. 66, no. 11, pages 999 - 1003, XP000653815 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - WEINREB M, "Histomorphometrical analysis of the effects of the bisphosphonate alendronate on bone loss caused by experimental periodontitis in monkeys", J. PERIODONT. RES., (1994), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 35 - 40, XP002100775 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0765.1994.tb01088.x | [X] - BRUNSWALD M. A., "Effects of a bisphosphonate on experimental periodontitis in monkeys", J. PERIODONTOL., (1992), vol. 63, no. 10, pages 825 - 830, XP002100776 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - IGARASHI K, "Anchorage and retentive effects of a bisphosphonate (AHBuBP) on tooth movements in rats", AM. J. ORTHODONT. DENTOFAC. OTHOPED., (1994), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 279 - 289, XP002100777 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - REDDY M.S., "Alendronate treatment of naturally-occurring periodontitis in Beagle dogs", J, PERIODONTOL., (199503), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 211 - 217, XP002100778 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4621077 (ROSINI SERGIO [IT], et al); | [Y]US5270365 (GERTZ BARRY J [US], et al); | [A]US5366965 (STREIN KLAUS [DE]); | [AP]US5431920 (BECHARD SIMON R [CA]); | [AP]US5462932 (BRENNER GERALD S [US], et al) |