EP0828745 - CONVERSION OF DEEP INTERNAL OLEFINS INTO PRIMARY ALKYL ALUMINUM COMPOUNDS BY ISOMERIZATION-DISPLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [2000/37] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1780 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMSEL, Edward, G. 915 Wylie Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96913993.0 | 10.05.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US06728 | Priority number, date | US19950438686 | 11.05.1995 Original published format: US 438686 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635693 | Date: | 14.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828745 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828745 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/06, // C07C1/32 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C07C1/327 (EP,US);
C07F5/062 (EP,US);
C07C2531/14 (EP,US);
C07C2531/22 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/327, C07C11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIEF-INTERNE OLEFINE IN PRIMÄRE ALKYLALUMINIUMVERBINDUNGEN DURCH ISOMERISIERUNG-VERDRÄNGUNG | [1998/12] | English: | CONVERSION OF DEEP INTERNAL OLEFINS INTO PRIMARY ALKYL ALUMINUM COMPOUNDS BY ISOMERIZATION-DISPLACEMENT | [1998/12] | French: | CONVERSION D'OLEFINES INTERNES PROFONDES EN COMPOSES PRIMAIRES D'ALKYLALUMINIUM PAR ISOMERISATION-DEPLACEMENT | [1998/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 05.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0574854 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0539876 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0525760 (ETHYL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DA]US3322806 (FRIEDRICH ASINGER, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |