EP0823948 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A PULP OF CELLULOSIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/08] | METHOD OF PRODUCING A PULP OF CELLULOSIC MATERIAL, THE PULP ITSELF AND THE USE THEREOF | ||
[2001/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natural Pulping AG Birkenstrasse 6 71364 Winnenden / DE | [1999/52] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Natural Pulping GmbH & Co. KG Silcherstr. 30 71364 Winnenden / DE | ||
Former [1998/08] | For all designated states Siegle, Sven Silcherstrasse 30 71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegle, Sven Silcherstrasse 30 71364 Winnenden / DE | [1998/22] |
Former [1998/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Mammel, Ulrike, et al Mammel & Maser Patentanwälte Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Mammel, Ulrike, et al Mammel & Maser Patent- und Markenanwälte Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | ||
Former [1999/02] | Mammel, Ulrike, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Kinkelin, Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte Weimarer Strasse 32/34 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | ||
Former [1998/22] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/08] | Mammel, Ulrike, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Kinkelin, Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte Weimarer Strasse 32/34 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914167.0 | 02.05.1996 | [1998/08] | WO1996EP01823 | Priority number, date | DE1995116151 | 03.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516151 | [1998/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9635013 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823948 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823948 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D21C3/04 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
D21C3/006 (EP,US);
D21C3/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/08] | D21C3/04, C08H5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/08] | Extension states | AL | 03.11.1997 | LT | 03.11.1997 | LV | 03.11.1997 | SI | 03.11.1997 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PULPE AUS ZELLULOSEHALTIGEM MATERIAL | [2001/28] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A PULP OF CELLULOSIC MATERIAL | [2001/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PULPE D'UN MATERIAU CELLULOSIQUE | [2001/28] |
Former [1998/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PULPE AUS ZELLULOSEHALTIGEM MATERIAL, DIE PULPE SELBST UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [1998/08] | METHOD OF PRODUCING A PULP OF CELLULOSIC MATERIAL, THE PULP ITSELF AND THE USE THEREOF | ||
Former [1998/08] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PULPE D'UN MATERIAU CELLULOSIQUE, PULPE OBTENUE ET SON UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/08] | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 27.11.2001 | [2002/11] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB850367 (CELLULOSE POLYMERES ET DERIVES); | [X]WO8201902 (JORDAN ROBERT K [US]); | [A]US4451567 (ISHIBASHI TADASHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO8605529 (KESKUSLABORATORIO [FI]); | [D]EP0250422 (KESKUSLABORATORIO [FI]); | [A]DE3830993 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [DA]EP0325891 (KUNZ HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0335242 (VALIO MEIJERIEN KESKUSOSUUSLIK [FI]); | [A]FR2665193 (KEMIRA OY [FI]); | [A]FR2672065 (KEMIRA OY [FI]); | [A]EP0508064 (ACETOCELL GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0584675 (KAEMMERER PROJEKT AGENTUR GMBH [DE]) |