EP0771566 - STABILIZATION OF COLLOIDAL SYSTEMS BY THE FORMATION OF IONIC LIPID-POLYSACCHARIDE COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCELL - Advanced In Vitro Cell Technologies Parc Cientific de Barcelona - Campus Diagonal - Edifici Modular C/ Josep Samitier 1-5 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states ADVANCELL - Advanced In Vitro Cell Technologies Parc Cientific de Barcelona - Campus Diagonal - Edifici Modular C/ Josep Samitier 1-5 08028 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states ADVANCELL - Advanced In Vitro Cell Tecnologies Parc Cientific de Barcelona - Campus Diagonal - Edifici Modular C/ Josep Samitier 1-5 08028 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states UNIVERSIDADE DE SANTIAGO DE COMPOSTELA Praza do Obradoire, Pazo de San Xerome 15705 Santiago de Compostela / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALONSO FERNANDEZ, Maria José Uni de Santiago de Compostela Dept de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | 02 /
CALVO SALVE, Pilar Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | 03 /
REMUNAN LOPEZ, Carmen Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | 04 /
VILA JATO, José Luis Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | [2005/28] |
Former [1997/19] | 01 /
ALONSO FERNANDEZ, Maria José Universidade de Sant ago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Composte / ES | ||
02 /
CALVO SALVE, Pilar Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | |||
03 /
REMUNAN LOPEZ, Carmen Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | |||
04 /
VILA JATO, José Luis Universidade de Santiago de Compostela Depto de Farmacoloxia Facultade de Farmacia 15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L., et al Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | ABG Patentes, S.L., et al Orense 68, 7th floor 28020 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2001/46] | Davila Baz, Angel, et al c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2001/16] | Hernandez Covarrubias, Arturo, et al c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [1997/19] | Hernandez Covarrubias, Arturo c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Avda. de los Encuartes 21 28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | Application number, filing date | 96914215.7 | 24.05.1996 | [1997/19] | WO1996ES00116 | Priority number, date | ES19950001035 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: ES 9501035 | [1997/19] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637232 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771566 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771566 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/24, A61K47/36 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/5153 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/5161 (EP,US);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US);
Y10S977/797 (EP,US);
Y10S977/801 (EP,US);
Y10S977/906 (EP,US);
Y10S977/907 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | STABILISATION VON KOLLOIDALEN SYSTEMEN DURCH DIE BILDUNG VON IONISCHEN LIPID-POLYSACCHARID-KOMPLEXEN | [1997/19] | English: | STABILIZATION OF COLLOIDAL SYSTEMS BY THE FORMATION OF IONIC LIPID-POLYSACCHARIDE COMPLEXES | [1997/19] | French: | STABILISATION DE SYSTEMES COLLOIDAUX PAR FORMATION DE COMPLEXES IONIQUES LIPIDE-POLYSACCHARIDE | [1997/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1997 | Translation filed | 22.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 04.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
CH | 13.07.2005 | ||
LI | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.07.2005 | |
SE | 13.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0486959 (VECTORPHARMA INT [IT]) [X] 1-6,9,12,13 * page 6; example 10 *; | [DA] - FALDT, P.; ET AL., "Stabilization by chitosan of soybean oil emulsions coated with phospholipid and glycocholic acid", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A: PHYSICOCHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, (1993), vol. 71, pages 187 - 195, XP002010333 [DA] 1-13 * the whole document * |