EP0773081 - CHUCK FOR CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tagami, Tetsuro 38-10, Yanokuchi, Inagi-Shi Tokyo-To / JP | [1999/38] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states Tagami, Tetsuro 1976-1, Yanochuchi, Inagi-shi Tokyo 206 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914405.4 | 23.05.1996 | [1997/20] | WO1996JP01361 | Priority number, date | JP19950128443 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12844395 | [1997/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637326 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773081 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773081 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/20 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
B23B31/202 (EP,US);
B23B31/2073 (EP,US);
B23B2226/33 (EP,US);
B23B2231/2016 (EP,US);
B23B2260/022 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17529 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17598 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17752 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17923 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/20] | Title | German: | SPANNFUTTER FÜR SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [1997/20] | English: | CHUCK FOR CUTTING TOOL | [1997/20] | French: | MANDRIN POUR OUTIL DE COUPE | [1997/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1997 | Translation filed | 24.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 24.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2836343 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1* figure 1; claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH0135765B ; | [A]JPH0337853B ; | [A]JPH0340497B |