EP0826056 - STABLE VARIANT HK2 POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYBRITECH INCORPORATED 11095 Torreyana Road San Diego California 92196-9006 / US | For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states HYBRITECH INCORPORATED 11095 Torreyana Road San Diego, California 92196-9006 / US | ||
For all designated states MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAEDI, Mohammad, S. 7898 Hendricks Drive San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
MIKOLAJCZYK, Stephen, D. 4052 Conrad Avenue San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 03 /
TINDALL, Donald, J. 2304 Telemark Lane Rochester, MN 55901 / US | 04 /
ROCHE, Patrick, C. 410-16th Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55902 / US | 05 /
BOSTWICK, David, G. 1142 Audaz Lane S.W. Rochester, MN 55902 / US | 06 /
KUMAR, Abhay 7675 Palmilla Drive, Unit 6223 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 07 /
KUUS-REICHEL, Kristine 5047 Litchfield Road San Diego, CA 92116 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96914567.1 | 02.05.1996 | [1998/10] | WO1996US06167 | Priority number, date | US19950427767 | 02.05.1995 Original published format: US 427767 | US19960622046 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: US 622046 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9634964 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826056 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/64, A61K38/48, C07K16/40, C12N5/24, G01N33/573, C12Q1/37 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
C12N9/6445 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/10] | Title | German: | STABILE VARIANTE DES HK2 POLYPEPTIDS | [1998/10] | English: | STABLE VARIANT HK2 POLYPEPTIDE | [1998/10] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE VARIANT HK2 STABLE | [1998/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2008 | 14.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9503334 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 18-29 * the whole document *; | [X] - M. SAEDI ET AL, "Overexpresson of a human prostate-specific glandular kallikrein, hK2, in E. coli and generation of antibodies", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19950401), vol. 109, pages 237 - 241, XP002015421 [X] 18-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0303-7207(95)03508-5 | [A] - VIHINEN M, "Modeling of prostate specific antigen and human glandular kallikrein structures.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS 204 (3). 1994. 1251-1256. ISSN: 0006-291X, XP002015422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1994.2597 |